GA HB1102 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 9 of Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to Georgia hazardous site reuse and redevelopment, so as to provide a 30 day grace period for buyers of qualifying property to seek a limitation of liability; to provide for automatic liability limitations to future recipients of qualified properties; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia hazardous site reuse and redevelopment; 30 day grace period for buyers of qualifying property to seek limitation of liability; provide
Sponsors
Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Judith Manning [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] |
Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #867 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #830 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #589 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #830 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #589 - Passage (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 699 | |
2012-05-01 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-27 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-23 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-02-23 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-22 | House First Readers |