GA HB1100 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to authorize the use of electronic notifications and communications by the Department of Revenue to motor vehicle owners relative to motor vehicle registration and certificates of title upon consent; to provide for standards and conditions to obtain such consent; to provide for the issuance of vehicle registration and license plates for government owned vehicles; to provide for exceptions; to revise a definition; to provide for conforming changes; to provide for the establishment of a system for the electronic storage and transfer of certificates of title; to authorize the transfer of certificates of title or granting of security interests therein electronically; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue, Department of; authorize use of electronic notifications and communications to motor vehicle owners; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly New [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Rep. Vance Smith [R] |
Rep. Dewey McClain [D] | Rep. Matt Barton [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #652 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #558 (Y: 99 N: 68 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #558 (Y: 99 N: 68 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Effective Date 2024-04-22 | |
2024-04-22 | Act 406 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-31 | House | House Hopper |