GA HB1098 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a Board of Commissioners of Meriwether County, approved December 14, 1871 (Ga. L. 1871-72, p. 230), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 13, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4365), so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to define certain terms and provide for certain inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Meriwether County; Board of Commissioners; change description of districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61514 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/204465 |