GA HB1088 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to the Board of Education of Colquitt County, approved March 12, 1970 (Ga. L. 1970, p. 2582), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 1, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 3684), so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office for current members; to provide for the submission of this Act for preclearance pursuant to Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Colquitt County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Ed Rynders [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #540 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House Vote #533 - Local Calendar (Y: 124 N: 10 NV: 23 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House Vote #533 - Local Calendar (Y: 124 N: 10 NV: 23 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-13 | Act 390 | |
2012-03-13 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-22 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-21 | House First Readers |