GA HB1086 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 9-16-15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to stay of civil forfeiture proceedings during pendency of criminal proceedings, so as to require the conclusion of criminal proceedings prior to civil forfeiture proceedings; to provide for an exception; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Civil practice; conclusion of criminal proceedings prior to civil forfeiture proceedings; require
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. James Burchett [R] |
Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-02 | House | House Hopper |