GA HB1078 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding courts, so as to authorize the assessment and collection of a technology fee by any court in this state; to specify the use of such fee; to provide for a segregated fund for such fee; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; assessment and collection of a technology fee by any court in this state; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. El-Mahdi Holly [D] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] |
Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House Hopper |