GA HB107 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 45-18-9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the right of continuation of health coverage for a spouse or dependent of a deceased public employee, so as to provide that the surviving spouse and dependents of a state employee killed while acting in the scope of his or her employment shall be entitled to continue coverage under the state health insurance plan under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health coverage; spouse and dependents of deceased public employee; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Beardon [R] | Sen. Johnny Grant [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] |
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Ann Purcell [R] | Rep. David Ralston [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #386 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 159 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #21 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Vote #19 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #21 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Vote #19 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 118 | |
2011-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-21 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-02-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-07 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-02-01 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-01 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-31 | House First Readers |