GA HB1063 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of South Fulton in Fulton County, Georgia, approved April 26, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3726), as amended, so as to limit the authority of the mayor and city council over personnel matters; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
South Fulton, City of; limit authority of mayor and city council over personal matters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #744 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #751 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #751 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 471 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-23 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-19 | House | House First Readers |
2018-03-19 | House | House Hopper |