GA HB1059 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to provide for exclusions to unfair trade practices and unlawful inducements; to allow an insurer or insurance producer to offer or provide a value-added product or service under certain conditions; to allow an insurer or insurance producer to implement a pilot program offering or providing a value-added product or service under certain conditions; to allow an insurer or insurance producer to offer or give a charitable donation under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; unfair trade practices and unlawful inducements; provide for exclusions
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] |
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #725 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #564 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #564 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 760 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |