GA HB1053 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state government, so as to prohibit governmental agencies from using central bank digital currency as payment and from participating in testing the use of such currency; to provide for definitions; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; prohibit governmental agencies from using central bank digital currency as payment
Sponsors
Rep. Carter Barrett [R] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] | Rep. Holt Persinger [R] | Rep. David Clark [R] |
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Johnny Chastain [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #731 (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #656 (Y: 136 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #656 (Y: 136 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-26 | House | House Hopper |