GA HB1053 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration of organizations providing services to runaway and homeless youth, so as to change a definition; to clarify that registered organizations are not exempt from the regulation of early care and education programs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Social services; registered organization are not exempt from regulation of early care and education programs; clarify
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Chandler [R] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] | Rep. Alex Atwood [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] |
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-02-26 | House | House Postponed |
2014-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-20 | House | House Hopper |