GA HB1051 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act completely revising the laws relative to the governing authority of Chatham County, approved March 29, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 5050), as amended, so as to provide for an additional power of the board to censure members; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chatham County; governing authority; provide additional power of the board to censure members
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Edward Stephens [D] | Rep. Craig Gordon [D] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Rep. R Bryant [D] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #586 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #582 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #582 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 565 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House Hopper |