GA HB1042 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 34 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "OneGeorgia Authority Act," so as to provide for a grant program to establish primary care medical facilities in health professional shortage areas; to provide for lease-purchase agreements; to provide for definitions; to provide for criteria for such program; to provide for application and approval thereof; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
OneGeorgia Authority Act; grant program to establish primary care medical facilities in health professional shortage areas; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Rep. Matt Barton [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #801 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #623 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #623 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 815 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |