GA HB1040 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to economic rehabilitation services, so as to require community action agencies to submit audit reports and IRS forms to the Department of Audits and Accounts before any contracts with the Department of Human Services are made or offered; to require each member of the board of directors of a community action agency to execute contracts between the community action agency and the Department of Human Services; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Social services; community action agencies to submit audit reports and IRS forms before any contracts are made with DHS; require
Sponsors
Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Rep. Terry England [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #628 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |