GA HB1026 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state symbols, so as to designate the Southeast Georgia Soap Box Derby as the official soap box derby of the State of Georgia; to provide for promotion of the Southeast Georgia Soap Box Derby; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; Southeast Georgia Soap Box Derby as official soap box derby of the State of Georgia; designate
Sponsors
Rep. Leesa Hagan [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] |
Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Rep. Devan Seabaugh [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #794 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #722 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #453 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #722 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #453 (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-24 | House | House Hopper |