GA HB1020 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-30 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-30 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county sales and use taxes, so as to provide for the comprehensive revision of the sales and use tax for educational purposes; to establish special districts; to provide for definitions, procedures, conditions, and limitations for the imposition, collection, disbursement, and termination of the tax; to provide for powers, duties, and authority of the state revenue commissioner; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to provide for applicability; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; county tax for educational purposes; revise
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-16 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-03-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-01 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-28 | House First Readers |