GA HB1019 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the Magistrate Court of Upson County to impose and collect county law library fees as part of the court costs in the magistrate court; to provide for practices and procedures connected therewith; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Upson County Magistrate Court; collect and impose county law library fees as part of court cost; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #491 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Vote #565 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Vote #565 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-28 | Act 503 | |
2016-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House Hopper |