GA HB1019 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding state government, so as to provide that each state agency that issues permits, licenses, certificates, and identification cards to citizens of this state shall issue replacement permits, licenses, certificates, or identification cards without charge to citizens who apply for such replacement permits, licenses, certificates, or identification cards and who demonstrate that their original permits, licenses, certificates, or identification cards were lost or destroyed as the direct result of a natural disaster; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; replacement permits, licenses, and identification cards; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Barnard [R] | Sen. Hardie Davis [D] | Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Rep. Terry Johnson [D] |
Rep. Alisha Morgan [D] | Rep. Quincy Murphy [D] | Rep. Rashad Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #776 - Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-24 | Act 432 | |
2010-05-24 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2010-02-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-01 | House Second Readers | |
2010-01-28 | House First Readers |