GA HB1017 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 45-9-85 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to payment of indemnification for death or disability, procedure for making payments, and appeal, so as to revise when dependents qualify for a payment of indemnification for death under the Georgia State Indemnification Fund; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public officers and employees; revise when dependents qualify for a payment of indemnification for death under the Georgia State Indemnification Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #679 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #588 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #588 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 385 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Hopper |