GA HB1010 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for the election of a chairperson and four members of the Worth County Board of Education, approved March 12, 1986 (Ga. L. 1986, p. 3719), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 13, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 5740), so as to reapportion the education districts; to define certain terms; to provide for members currently serving; to provide for the submission of this Act to the United States Department of Justice; to provide for related matters; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Worth County; Board of Education; reapportion districts
Sponsors
Rep. Buddy Harden [R] | Rep. Ed Rynders [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #525 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Vote #514 - Local Calendar (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Vote #514 - Local Calendar (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-05 | Act 351 | |
2012-03-05 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-16 | House First Readers |