GA HB100 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 and Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating, respectively, to education and revenue and taxation, so as to revise and change certain provisions regarding educational improvement and student scholarship organizations; to change certain definitions; to change certain requirements regarding operation and taxation of student scholarship organizations; to provide for criminal penalties regarding student scholarship organization requirements; to revise and change certain provisions regarding the qualified education income tax credit; to provide an effective date; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; student scholarship organizations; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Sen. Eric Johnson [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. John Lunsford [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #236 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #235 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 36th (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-02-24 - House - House Vote #68 - Pass (Y: 98 N: 69 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #235 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 36th (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-02-24 - House - House Vote #68 - Pass (Y: 98 N: 69 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Veto V2 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-02-24 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-24 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-16 | House First Readers |