GA HB1 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-23 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-23 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to provide for the compensation of pregnant women who but for a fetal heartbeat law could choose to terminate the pregnancy but are compelled to carry the pregnancy to term and give birth to a child; to specify the type and duration of compensation; to provide for procedures and requirements to obtain compensation; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Pro-Birth Accountability Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Jasmine Clark [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Viola Davis [D] |
Rep. Park Cannon [D] | Rep. Shelly Hutchinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-11 | House | House Hopper |
2022-11-22 | House | House Prefiled |