FL S0416 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing lists of raw agricultural commodities at high risk or potentially at risk for cultivation in a genetically engineered form; requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to publish the lists by a specified date and to update a published list annually; providing for enforcement of the labeling requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labeling of Genetically Engineered Foods

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Agriculture
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Agriculture; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy
2015-01-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0351 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50092Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback