FL H0351 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides lists of raw agricultural commodities at high risk or potentially at risk for cultivation in genetically engineered form; requires DACS to publish list by specified date & annualy update list; provides mandatory labeling requirements for genetically engineered raw agricultural commodities & processed foods made with or derived from genetically engineered ingredients; provides for enforcement of labeling requirements; provides civil remedies & penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labeling of Genetically Engineered Foods

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-28HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2015-01-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0416 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Agriculture

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50092Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback