FL S7080 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement agency that permits its law enforcement officers to wear body cameras to establish policies and procedures addressing the proper use, maintenance, and storage of body cameras and the data recorded by body cameras; requiring such a law enforcement agency to ensure that specified personnel are trained in the law enforcement agency's policies and procedures; requiring that data recorded by body cameras be retained in accordance with specified requirements, etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Officer Body Cameras
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/15 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Filed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/07/15, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Criminal Justice |
Same As/Similar To
H0057 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice