FL S7062 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to revise threshold requirements for the number of petitions signed by electors needed in order for a citizen initiative to amend or revise the State Constitution to be placed on the ballot, etc.
Title
Citizen Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H7093 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary