FL S7036 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending a provision which provides a public records exemption for identifying information of persons reporting child abuse, abandonment, or neglect; abrogating the scheduled repeal of the exemption and the reversion of specified statutory text, etc.
Title
OGSR/Identifying Information of Persons Reporting Child Abuse, Abandonment, or Neglect
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7001 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Substituted HB 7001 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/15/24 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/30/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Filed |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H7001 (Same As) 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-38