FL S7032 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Removing the public records exemption for information held by the State Child Abuse Death Review Committee or a local committee that reveals the identity of family members or others living in the home of a child whose death occurred as a result of a verified report of abuse or neglect; exempting information held by the State Child Abuse Death Review Committee or a local committee that identifies a deceased child whose death is reported to the central abuse hotline but whose death is not the result of abuse or neglect and the identity of the surviving siblings, family members, or others living in the home of such a deceased child; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Reports of a Deceased Child

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#269 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-77
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-24SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-24HousePassed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-23HouseSubstituted for HB 7129
2015-04-21HouseReceived
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-21HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-14HouseIn Messages
2015-04-08SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2015-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-02SenateOrdered engrossed
2015-04-02SenateAmendment(s) adopted (659968)
2015-04-02SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/15
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-26SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-17SenateNow in Rules
2015-03-17SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2015-03-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-20SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2015-02-18SenateFiled
2015-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2015-02-09SenateSubmitted for consideration by Health Policy

Same As/Similar To

H7129 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7032 (Ch. 2015-77)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
383412Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback