FL S7030 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7099
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7099
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ratifying a specified rule relating to emergency environmental control for nursing homes for the sole and exclusive purpose of satisfying any condition on effectiveness pursuant to s. 120.541(3), F.S., which requires ratification of any rule exceeding the specified thresholds for likely adverse impact on or increase in regulatory costs, etc.
Title
Ratification of Agency for Health Care Administration Rules
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7099 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Substituted HB 7099 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H7099 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-123