FL S7010 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amending provisions relating to an exemption from public records requirements for certain payment instrument transaction information held by the Office of Financial Regulation; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Payment Instrument Transaction Information/Office of Financial Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 7075
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted HB 7075
2018-03-07SenateAmendment(s) adopted (544148)
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-30SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-30SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/30/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-17SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-01-12SenateFiled
2018-01-10SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-05SenateSubmitted for consideration by Banking and Insurance

Same As/Similar To

H7075 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-116

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
560312Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback