FL S7002 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7027 (Ch. 2023-308)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Ratifying specified rules relating to standards for onsite sewage treatment and disposal systems and for domestic wastewater facility planning for facilities expansion, collection/transmission systems, and an operation and maintenance manual for the sole and exclusive purpose of satisfying any condition on effectiveness pursuant to s. 120.541(3), F.S., which requires ratification of any rule exceeding the specified thresholds for likely adverse impact or increase in regulatory costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ratification of Rules of the Department of Environmental Protection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7027 (Ch. 2023-308)
2023-05-03SenateSubstituted HB 7027
2023-05-03SenateRead 2nd time
2023-04-28SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23
2023-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-04-13SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2023-04-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2023-03-21SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2023-03-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2023-03-17SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations
2023-03-17SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules
2023-03-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2023-03-15SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2023-03-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-02-28SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Rules
2023-02-21SenateFiled
2023-02-21SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2023-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/21/23, 9:30 am, 301 Senate Building
2023-02-13SenateSubmitted for consideration by Environment and Natural Resources

Same As/Similar To

H7027 (Same As) 2023-06-29 - Chapter No. 2023-308

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
120541Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/Amendment/177856/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/Analyses/2023s07002.pre.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/Analyses/2023s07002.en.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/Analyses/2023s07002.pre.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/Analyses/2023s07002.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/Analyses/2023s07002.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/Analyses/2023s07002.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/Vote/2023-02-21%200930AM~S07002%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/Vote/2023-03-15%200100PM~S07002%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7002/Vote/2023-04-13%201030AM~S07002%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback