FL S2790 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1484 (Ch. 2010-144)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1484 (Ch. 2010-144)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Grants and Donations Trust Fund within the Department of Financial Services. Provides for the purpose of the trust fund and sources of funds. Provides for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund.
Title
Grants and Donations Trust Fund/DFS [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Negron [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0003 - Trust Fund Bills (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1484 (Ch. 2010-144) | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages | |
2010-04-26 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00806; Passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 -SJ 00807 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00781 | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable by- General Government Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00651; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00651 | |
2010-04-14 | Introduced -SJ 00553; On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 401-S | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to General Government Appropriations -SJ 00553 | |
2010-03-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0008 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1484 (Ch. 2010-144)
S1484 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-144
S1484 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-144