FL S2668 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses the legislative intent to revise laws relating to ethics.
Title
SSB/Ethics [GPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00226 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00226 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |