FL S2664 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses the legislative intent to revise laws relating to education.
Title
SSB/Education [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00226 | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Education Pre-K - 12; Rules -SJ 00226 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |