FL S2512 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the advisory council within the legislative branch; authorizing the advisory council to consult with specified persons in furtherance of its duties; requiring the Department of Management Services to periodically brief the advisory council with respect to planned actions regarding the Capitol Complex, etc.
Title
Capitol Complex Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#479 (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#129 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#129 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70) | |
2017-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 110 NAYS 2 |
2017-05-08 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted (254222) |
2017-05-08 | House | Conference Committee Report considered |
2017-05-08 | House | In returning messages |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report adopted (254222) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Latvala (Chair), Flores (Vice Chair), Baxley (At Large), Benacquisto (At Large), Bradley (At Large), Braynon (At Large), Clemens (At Large), Galvano (At Large), Grimsley (At Large), Montford (At Large), Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Bean (Chair), Baxley, Bracy, Clemens, Perry; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Governmental Operations and Technology: Grimsley (Chair), Bean, Broxson, Campbell, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodriguez, Rouson, Torres; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Flores (Chair), Baxley, Book, Passidomo, Powell, Rader, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Galvano (Chair), Bradley, Clemens, Farmer, Lee, Simmons; Appropriations Conference Committee on Pre-K - 12 Education/Pre K - 12 Education: Simmons (Chair), Broxson, Farmer, Grimsley, Lee, Montford, Rouson, Young; Appropriations Conference Committee on the Environment and Natural Resources/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Bradley (Chair), Book, Braynon, Hutson, Latvala, Mayfield, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Tourism: Brandes (Chair), Benacquisto, Gainer, Gibson, Passidomo, Powell, Rader, Simpson, Thurston |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Governmental Operations and Technology: Representatives Ingoglia (Chair), Altman, Avila, Cortes, J., Davis, DuBose, Eagle, Grant, J., Hahnfeldt, Peters, Plasencia, Raulerson, Shaw, Willhite |
2017-04-27 | House | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee) |
2017-04-14 | Senate | In returning messages |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed the Senate bill as amended by the House and we accede to conference |
2017-04-13 | House | Immediately certified |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-13 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (446807) |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-12 | House | Received |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-04-12 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2017-04-12 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/17 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/05/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
S2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Line Item(s) Overridden 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37
H5001 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), HB 5203 (Ch. 2017-191), HB 5205 (Ch. 2017-157), HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 5403 (Ch. 2017-159), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125), SB 2506 (Ch. 2017-126), SB 2508 (Ch. 2017-127), SB 2510 (Ch. 2017-128), SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129), SB 7022 (Ch. 2017-88)
H5001 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), HB 5203 (Ch. 2017-191), HB 5205 (Ch. 2017-157), HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 5403 (Ch. 2017-159), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71), SB 2504 (Ch. 2017-125), SB 2506 (Ch. 2017-126), SB 2508 (Ch. 2017-127), SB 2510 (Ch. 2017-128), SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129), SB 7022 (Ch. 2017-88)