FL S2286 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Reapportionment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Reapportionment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses the legislative intent to propose an amendment to the State Constitution relating to congressional redistricting.
Title
SSB/Congressional Redistricting [GPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Reapportionment | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00197 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Reapportionment; Ethics and Elections; Rules -SJ 00197 | |
2010-02-23 | Filed |