FL S2088 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising provisions relating to benefits paid from the premium tax by a municipality or special fire control district that has its own pension plan; providing for retroactive application; revising the definition of the term "compensation" or "salary" for purposes of police officers' pensions; revising provisions relating to benefits paid by a municipality that has its own pension plan, etc.
Title
Public Retirement Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Community Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/13/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time -SJ 341 | |
2012-02-06 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 326 | |
2012-02-02 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-01 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 326 | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced -SJ 303 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/01/12, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 303 | |
2012-01-27 | Filed | |
2012-01-27 | SPB 7200 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2088) by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
175 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |