FL S2074 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table -SJ 1218
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Laid on Table -SJ 1218
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the duties of the case manager for, and the community living support plan of, a mental health resident of an assisted living facility; requiring the revocation of a facility license for certain violations that result in the death of a resident; requiring the licensure of facility administrators; revising training requirements for staff who provide care for persons with Alzheimer's disease and related disorders; providing that a facility that terminates an individual's residency will be fined if good cause is not shown in court; providing grounds for disciplinary action for assisted living facility administrators, etc.
Title
Assisted Living Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Laid on Table -SJ 1218 | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time -SJ 1216 | |
2012-03-08 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/12 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/12 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 805 | |
2012-03-05 | Withdrawn from Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; Budget -SJ 805 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 02/28/12, 10:45 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Health Regulation read 1st time -SJ 340 | |
2012-02-03 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2012-02-03 | Now in Budget -SJ 326 | |
2012-02-02 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/31/12, 15 minutes after adjournment, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-27 | Introduced -SJ 281 | |
2012-01-27 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 281 | |
2012-01-26 | Filed | |
2012-01-26 | SPB 7174 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2074) by Health Regulation |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 4574 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
415 | 1034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 176 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 178 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 256 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1635 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1645 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1665 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1685 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1725 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1735 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1745 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1756 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |