FL S1968 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides circumstances under which a voting system audit is not required to be conducted. Deletes certain required justifications for a supervisor to send an absentee ballot to an alternative address. Increases the number of days before an election that a county canvassing board may begin canvassing absentee ballots and processing absentee ballots when electronic tabulating equipment is used.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Sachs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-22 | Introduced -SJ 250 | |
2011-03-17 | Subreferred to Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections -SJ 253 | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Rules; Budget -SJ 250 | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1968 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1968/BillText/Filed/HTML |