FL S1948 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the "Pain-capable Unborn Child Protection Act." Requires a physician to determine the probable postfertilization age of an unborn child before performing or inducing an abortion or attempting to perform or induce an abortion. Requires the physician to inquire and conduct necessary medical examinations to determine the probable postfertilization age of an unborn child. Requires a physician who performs or induces or attempts to perform or induce an abortion to report to the Department of Health certain information, etc.
Title
Abortions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-22 | Introduced -SJ 248 | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 248 | |
2011-03-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1948 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1948/BillText/Filed/HTML |