FL S1890 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing a limitation on contributions made to political committees sponsoring or opposing a constitutional amendment proposed by initiative; preempting counties, municipalities, and other local governmental entities from enacting or adopting any limitation or restriction involving certain contributions and expenditures, or establishing contribution limits different than those established in the Florida Election Code; prohibiting a candidate from donating surplus funds to a charitable organization that employs the candidate; providing that any candidate required to dispose surplus funds may give certain surplus funds to the state or a political subdivision, to be disbursed in a specified manner, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Financing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#304 (Y: 75 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ethics and Elections (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11 Chapter No. 2021-16
2021-05-07 Approved by Governor
2021-05-06 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-26SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-04-26HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-26HouseCS passed; YEAS 75, NAYS 40
2021-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-23HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-23HouseAmendment 265735 Failed
2021-04-23HouseAmendment 893237 Failed
2021-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-23HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 699
2021-04-23HouseAmendment 416403 withdrawn
2021-04-23HouseAmendment 140927 withdrawn
2021-04-23HouseAmendment 538709 withdrawn
2021-04-21HouseAmendment 416403 filed
2021-04-21HouseAmendment 140927 filed
2021-04-21HouseAmendment 893237 filed
2021-04-21HouseAmendment 265735 filed
2021-04-21HouseAmendment 538709 filed
2021-04-20House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-20HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/23/2021)
2021-04-20HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-15HouseIn Messages
2021-04-15SenateImmediately certified
2021-04-15SenateCS passed; YEAS 23 NAYS 17
2021-04-15SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) failed (110510)
2021-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/21
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-07SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2021-04-07SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-04-06SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 6
2021-04-01SenateCS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
2021-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/06/21, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-01SenateNow in Rules
2021-03-31SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-30SenateCS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 5 NAYS 4
2021-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/30/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/16/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Rules
2021-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H699 (Similar To) 2021-04-23 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1890
S656 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Amendment/395226/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Amendment/466788/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Amendment/359104/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Amendment/110510/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Amendment/140927/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Amendment/893237/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Amendment/538709/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Amendment/265735/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Amendment/416403/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Analyses/2021s01890.pre.ee.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Analyses/2021s01890.ee.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Analyses/2021s01890.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Analyses/2021s01890.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Vote/SenateVote_s01890c2003.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Vote/HouseVote_s01890c2304.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Vote/2021-03-30%201230PM~S01890%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1890/Vote/2021-04-06%200930AM~S01890%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback