FL S1890 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Replaces the definition of the term "instant message name" with the definition of the term "Internet identifier." Provides that voluntary disclosure of specified information waives a disclosure exemption for such information. Requires disclosure of passport and immigration status information. Requires a specified national search of registration information regarding sexual predators and sexual offenders prior to appointment or employment of persons by state agencies and governmental subdivisions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Offenders and Predators

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-26 CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time -SJ 493
2011-04-25 Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Judiciary (412196); YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 468
2011-04-20 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/25/11, 9:45 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-04-15 Now in Judiciary -SJ 470
2011-04-14 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-04-12 CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 470
2011-04-07 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2011-03-30 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/04/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2011-03-22 Introduced -SJ 240
2011-03-17 Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 240
2011-03-05 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94304351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94304354Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430437Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
947005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985481Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9854815Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback