FL S1886 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 737
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 737
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certain hallucinogenic substances on the list of controlled substances in Schedule I. Reenacts provisions relating to prohibited acts and penalties regarding controlled substances and the offense severity chart of the Criminal Punishment Code, to incorporate the amendment to s. 893.03, F.S., in references thereto.
Title
Controlled Substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -SJ 737 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/11 | |
2011-04-27 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-26 | CS by- Budget; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/26/11, 9:45 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-04-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/25/11, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-04-07 | Now in Budget -SJ 322 | |
2011-04-05 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Criminal Justice (567276); YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 322 | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/04/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-22 | Introduced -SJ 239 | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 239 | |
2011-03-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
893 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |