FL S1880 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excluding certain securities offers and sales by specified persons from the exemption from specified registration requirements; revising requirements for securities offers and sales that are exempt transactions under specified laws; revising the information and documents that the Office of Financial Regulation may require for securities registration; revising circumstances under which the office may revoke or suspend securities registrations; deleting issuers of securities from the list of persons that may not offer for sale or sell securities without being registered; requiring finders to maintain certain books and records, etc.
Title
Offers and Sales of Securities
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H779 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
517 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 0611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 1217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 1611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1880 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1880/BillText/Filed/HTML |