FL S1878 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising provisions related to parenting coordination to include child support plans; authorizing a court to use a child support plan in its creation or approval of a certain schedule in a child support order or an income deduction order; removing the authority of the court to order the payment of attorney fees, suit money, and the cost of maintaining or defending a proceeding under ch. 61, F.S.; requiring a parent seeking an upward modification of an existing award to demonstrate that prior support payments have been used solely for the benefit of the child, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6130Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback