FL S1872 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages retail sales establishments to have a functioning automated external defibrillator. Requires training, maintenance, and location registration. Provides immunity from liability under the Good Samaritan Act and the Cardiac Arrest Survival Act. Authorizes the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to adopt rules.
Title
Retail Sales Establishments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-22 | Introduced -SJ 238 | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 239 | |
2011-03-05 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1872 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1872/BillText/Filed/HTML |