FL S1854 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "intellectual disability" as it relates to defendants who have been found to be incompetent to proceed by adding the terms "significantly deficient in adaptive functioning" and "traumatic brain injury"; requiring the Agency for Persons with Disabilities to assist certain defendants found incompetent to proceed with application to the long-term care managed care program, etc.
Title
Defendants with a Traumatic Brain Injury
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/23/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
916 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |