FL S1854 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting Internet service providers from using, disclosing, selling, or permitting external access to certain customer information, except under specified conditions; prohibiting providers from retaining customer information any longer than necessary, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband Service Privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Regulated Industries; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3640131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback