FL S1832 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Senate and House of Representatives to appoint a Joint Legislative Review Committee to oversee the review of exemptions from the tax on sales, use, and other transactions and make recommendations regarding the review; creating the "Florida Sales Tax Fairness Restoration Act"; providing for future elimination of all sales, rental, use, consumption, distribution, and storage tax exemptions under s. 212.08, F.S., except those for general groceries, medical, guide dogs for the blind, hospital meals and rooms, household fuels, meals delivered by nonprofit volunteer organizations as a charitable function, and certain books, lunches, and publications used or provided at schools for students grades K through 12, etc.
Title
Review of Exemptions and Exclusions from the Tax on Sales, Use, and Other Transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | |
2012-01-18 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | |
2012-01-18 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax -SJ 255 | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 239 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Budget -SJ 239 | |
2012-01-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 097 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1832 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1832/BillText/Filed/HTML |