FL S1828 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting an employer from taking retaliatory personnel action against an employee who has left a place of employment to evacuate under an mandatory evacuation order; providing employee remedies and relief, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment Discrimination

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H225 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
448077Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback